+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (23)
On November 4, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Signed Chap.400
On October 26, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Returned To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- 3rd Reading Cal.1816
- Substituted For S3911b
On June 14, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.265
- Rules Report Cal.265
- Reported
- Passed Assembly
- Delivered To Senate
On June 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Rules
On June 2, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Rules
On May 31, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Print Number 2558d
- Amend And Recommit To Higher Education
On May 25, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Print Number 2558c
- Amend (t) And Recommit To Higher Education
On January 6, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Higher Education
On June 8, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Print Number 2558b
- Amend And Recommit To Higher Education
On February 11, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Print Number 2558a
- Amend And Recommit To Higher Education
On January 20, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Higher Education
+ − Vote
June 15, 2016: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 62
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor