+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On December 19, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Returned To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- 3rd Reading Cal.1702
- Substituted For S9106
On May 5, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred To Social Services
On May 5, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
On March 25, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Advanced To Third Reading Cal.497
On March 22, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Reported
On January 5, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Social Services
On January 19, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Social Services
+ − Vote
June 1, 2022: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 46
- Nays: 17