+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On January 3, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.201
On March 16, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Advanced To Third Reading Cal.139
On March 13, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Reported
On March 7, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Codes
On January 20, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Insurance