+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On March 29, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Codes
On January 6, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Correction
On June 8, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Ways And Means
On June 2, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Codes
On January 16, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Correction