+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On June 7, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Substituted By S5785a
On June 1, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Amended On Third Reading (t) 2502a
- Restored To Third Reading
- Substitution Reconsidered
On May 24, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Substituted By S5785
- Rules Report Cal.82
- Reported
On May 19, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Rules
On January 19, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Judiciary
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor