+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (21)
On December 13, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Signed Chap.647
- Approval Memo.38
On December 6, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Governor
On April 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- 3rd Reading Cal.75
- Substituted For S2139b
- Recommitted To Environmental Conservation
On April 30, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Repassed Assembly
On April 10, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Recalled From Senate
- Amended On Third Reading 2501a
On April 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned To Assembly
On April 10, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Vote Reconsidered - Restored To Third Reading
On February 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred To Environmental Conservation
On February 27, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
On February 21, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Advanced To Third Reading Cal.61
On February 11, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Reported
On January 29, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Codes
On January 23, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Environmental Conservation
+ − Vote
April 30, 2019: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 62
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor