+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On June 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Rules
On June 15, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
On June 9, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Amended On Third Reading (t) 2499a
On May 26, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Advanced To Third Reading Cal.751
On May 24, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Reported
On March 8, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Ways And Means
On January 6, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Governmental Operations
On January 16, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Governmental Operations