+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (35)
On August 24, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Signed Chap.209
On August 13, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Returned To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- 3rd Reading Cal.1336
- Substituted For S2565c
On January 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred To Mental Health And Developmental Disabilities
On January 9, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
On January 3, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.16
On January 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Returned To Assembly
- Died In Senate
On June 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committed To Rules
On June 6, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Repassed Assembly
On May 24, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Recalled From Senate
On May 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Returned To Assembly
On May 24, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Amended On Third Reading (t) 249c
- Vote Reconsidered - Restored To Third Reading
On May 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Recommitted To Mental Health And Developmental Disabilities
On May 15, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Repassed Assembly
On May 8, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Amended On Third Reading 249b
On May 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Returned To Assembly
On May 3, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Recalled From Senate
- Vote Reconsidered - Restored To Third Reading
- Amended On Third Reading 249a
On May 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred To Mental Health And Developmental Disabilities
On May 1, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
On April 27, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Advanced To Third Reading Cal.171
On April 25, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Reported
On March 28, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Ways And Means
On January 11, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Reference Changed To Mental Health
On January 5, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Transportation
+ − Vote
June 19, 2018: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 62
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (43)
Type:
Primary Sponsor