+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (25)
On September 30, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Tabled
On September 29, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Vetoed Memo.212
On September 20, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Returned To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- 3rd Reading Cal.1909
- Substituted For S7431a
- Referred To Rules
On June 16, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
On June 8, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Rules Report Cal.118
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.118
- Amended On Third Reading 2462a
On June 7, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Reported
On June 6, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Rules
- Reported Referred To Ways And Means
On May 24, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Codes
On January 6, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Labor
On June 10, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.217
- Rules Report Cal.217
- Reported
On June 3, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Rules
On June 2, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Ways And Means
On May 28, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Codes
On January 16, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Labor
+ − Vote
June 16, 2016: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 60
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor