+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (20)
On December 7, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Signed Chap.397
- Approval Memo.7
On November 26, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Returned To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- 3rd Reading Cal.1747
- Substituted For S2084
On February 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred To Children And Families
On February 27, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
On January 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Died In Senate
On January 3, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.193
On January 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Returned To Assembly
On May 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred To Children And Families
On May 17, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
On May 11, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Advanced To Third Reading Cal.325
On May 9, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Reported
On February 7, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Ways And Means
On January 20, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Children And Families
+ − Vote
June 13, 2018: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 60
- Present/NV: 3
+ − Sponsors (23)
Type:
Primary Sponsor