+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On April 25, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Substituted By S2838c
- Rules Report Cal.82
- Reported
- Reported Referred To Rules
On February 9, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Print Number 2412b
- Amend And Recommit To Ways And Means
On January 5, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Ways And Means
On June 10, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Rules
On May 25, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Ways And Means
On April 28, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Print Number 2412a
- Amend (t) And Recommit To Energy
On January 19, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Energy
+ − Sponsors (24)
Type:
Primary Sponsor