+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On January 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to finance
On January 22, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Delivered to senate
- Passed assembly
On January 8, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading cal.135
On January 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Returned to assembly
- Died in senate
On June 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committed to rules
- Substitution reconsidered
On May 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- 3rd reading cal.560
- Substituted for s4825
On February 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to finance
On February 11, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Delivered to senate
- Passed assembly
On February 7, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Advanced to third reading cal.35
On February 5, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Reported
On January 14, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to governmental operations