+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On August 21, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Signed Chap.175
On August 9, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Returned To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- 3rd Reading Cal.410
- Substituted For S2422
On May 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred To Health
On May 9, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
On May 4, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Advanced To Third Reading Cal.272
On May 2, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Reported
On January 18, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Health
+ − Vote
June 5, 2017: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 62
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor