+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On January 6, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Consumer Affairs And Protection
On May 29, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Advanced To Third Reading Cal.471
On May 28, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Reported
On April 28, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Codes
On January 16, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Consumer Affairs And Protection
+ − Sponsors (19)
Type:
Primary Sponsor