+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On July 20, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Amended On Third Reading 2331a
On January 8, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.99
On January 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- Returned To Assembly
- Died In Senate
On February 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred To Transportation
On February 27, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
On February 21, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Advanced To Third Reading Cal.59
On February 12, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Reported
On January 22, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Transportation
+ − Sponsors (28)
Type:
Primary Sponsor