+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On January 8, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading cal.128
On January 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Returned to assembly
- Died in senate
On June 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to codes
On June 13, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Delivered to senate
- Passed assembly
On May 31, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Advanced to third reading cal.458
On May 29, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Reported
On March 15, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Print number 2259a
- Amend and recommit to codes
On January 9, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to codes
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor