+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On September 22, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Signed Chap.241
On September 15, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Returned To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- Substituted For S5240
On February 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Judiciary
On February 9, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
On February 5, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Advanced To Third Reading Cal.13
On February 3, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Reported
On January 15, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Judiciary
+ − Vote
June 18, 2015: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 46
- Nays: 15
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor