+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On December 28, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Tabled
- Vetoed Memo.309
On December 16, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Returned To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.1915
On June 24, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
- Home Rule Request
On June 15, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.318
- Rules Report Cal.318
- Reported
On June 11, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Rules
On January 7, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Ways And Means
+ − Vote
June 25, 2015: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 37
- Nays: 22
- Present/NV: 3
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor