+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On March 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to housing, construction and community development
On March 19, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Delivered to senate
- Passed assembly
On January 8, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading cal.122
On January 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Returned to assembly
- Died in senate
On June 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to housing, construction and community development
On June 11, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Delivered to senate
- Passed assembly
On May 9, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Advanced to third reading cal.301
On May 7, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Reported
On February 4, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Reported referred to ways and means
On January 9, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to real property taxation
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor