+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (12)
On May 20, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Print number 2179e
- Amend and recommit to labor
On January 8, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Referred to labor
On June 17, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Print number 2179d
- Amend and recommit to labor
- Print number 2179c
- Amend and recommit to labor
On May 23, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Print number 2179b
- Amend and recommit to labor
On May 9, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Print number 2179a
- Amend and recommit to labor
On January 9, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to labor
+ − Sponsors (31)
Type:
Primary Sponsor