+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On February 26, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Enacting clause stricken
On January 13, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Committed to environmental conservation
On January 8, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading cal.119
On January 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Returned to assembly
- Died in senate
On June 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to environmental conservation
On June 5, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Delivered to senate
- Passed assembly
On May 2, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Advanced to third reading cal.245
On April 30, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Reported
On January 9, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to environmental conservation
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor