+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On June 16, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading rules cal.246
- Rules report cal.246
- Reported
On June 12, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Reported referred to rules
On April 7, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Reported referred to ways and means
On March 25, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Reported referred to codes
On February 14, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Print number 2115b
- Amend and recommit to agriculture
On January 8, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Referred to agriculture
On April 24, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Print number 2115a
- Amend (t) and recommit to agriculture
On January 9, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to agriculture
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor