+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On February 19, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Delivered to secretary of state
On January 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Returned to assembly
- Passed senate
- 3rd reading cal.2
- Substituted for s2107
On January 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to rules
On January 14, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Delivered to senate
- Passed assembly
- Ordered to third reading rules cal.2
- Rules report cal.2
- Reported
- Reported referred to rules
- Reported referred to judiciary
On January 10, 2013 in the Assembly:
- To attorney-general for opinion
On January 9, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to governmental operations
+ − Vote
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor