+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On May 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Civil Service And Pensions
On May 10, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
On January 20, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Amended On Third Reading 2078a
On January 6, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.100
On January 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Returned To Assembly
- Died In Senate
On March 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Civil Service And Pensions
On March 26, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
On March 5, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Advanced To Third Reading Cal.76
On March 3, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Reported
On January 15, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Governmental Employees