+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On May 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to investigations and government operations
On May 19, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Delivered to senate
- Passed assembly
On January 8, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading cal.115
On January 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Returned to assembly
- Died in senate
On June 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to investigations and government operations
On June 3, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Delivered to senate
- Passed assembly
On May 9, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Advanced to third reading cal.299
On May 7, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Reported
On April 23, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Reported referred to codes
On January 9, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to governmental operations
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor