+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On June 19, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Substituted By S894a
On June 15, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.371
- Rules Report Cal.371
- Reported
On June 8, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Rules
On June 7, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Ways And Means
On May 26, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Print Number 2031a
- Amend And Recommit To Transportation
On January 17, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Transportation
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor