+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On January 12, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Amended On Third Reading 1998a
On January 6, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.94
On January 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Returned To Assembly
- Died In Senate
On May 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Judiciary
On May 18, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
On May 14, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Advanced To Third Reading Cal.352
On May 12, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Reported
- Reported Referred To Codes
On January 13, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Judiciary
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor