+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On July 12, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Signed chap.106
- Signed chap.106
On July 2, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Delivered to governor
On May 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Returned to assembly
- Passed senate
- 3rd reading cal.558
- Substituted for s3768
On February 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to health
On February 4, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Delivered to senate
- Passed assembly
On January 31, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Advanced to third reading cal.13
On January 29, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Print number 1935a
- Reported with amendment (t)
On January 9, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to health
+ − Vote
May 7, 2013: FLOOR VOTE: - May 7, 2013
- Yeas: 61
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 1
Details:
+
−
- José Rivera: yea
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor