+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On February 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Energy And Telecommunications
On February 1, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
On January 6, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.87
On January 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Returned To Assembly
- Died In Senate
On June 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Rules
On June 18, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
On June 10, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.210
- Rules Report Cal.210
- Reported
On June 8, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Rules
On June 2, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Codes
On January 13, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Consumer Affairs And Protection
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor