+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On March 10, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Advanced To Third Reading Cal.431
On March 7, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Reported
On January 6, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Consumer Affairs And Protection
On March 5, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Advanced To Third Reading Cal.71
On March 3, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Reported
On January 13, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Consumer Affairs And Protection
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor