+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On January 3, 2024 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.56
On January 3, 2024 in the Senate:
- Returned To Assembly
- Died In Senate
On May 18, 2023 in the Senate:
- Referred To Codes
On May 18, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
On March 15, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Amended On Third Reading 1880a
On February 16, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Advanced To Third Reading Cal.11
On February 14, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Reported
On January 23, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Codes
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor