+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On May 31, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred To Commerce, Economic Development And Small Business
On May 31, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
On May 24, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Advanced To Third Reading Cal.941
On May 22, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Reported
On April 17, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Ways And Means
On January 3, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Small Business
On January 4, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Small Business