+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On January 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to aging
On January 22, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Delivered to senate
- Passed assembly
On January 8, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading cal.104
On January 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Returned to assembly
- Died in senate
On May 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to finance
On May 6, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Delivered to senate
- Passed assembly
On May 2, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Advanced to third reading cal.244
On April 30, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Reported
On January 29, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Reported referred to ways and means
On January 9, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to aging
+ − Sponsors (19)
Type:
Primary Sponsor