+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (11)
On January 8, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.85
On June 13, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.242
- Rules Report Cal.242
- Reported
On June 11, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Rules
On June 6, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Print Number 1845b
- Amend And Recommit To Codes
On May 29, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Print Number 1845a
- Amend And Recommit To Codes
On May 7, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Codes
On January 17, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Banks
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor