+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On April 16, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Enacting Clause Stricken
- Recommitted To Labor
On January 3, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.135
On May 25, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Advanced To Third Reading Cal.491
On May 23, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Reported
On January 13, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Labor
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor