+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On June 19, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Substituted By S3227a
On June 11, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.96
- Rules Report Cal.96
- Reported
On June 6, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Rules
On June 5, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Ways And Means
On May 31, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Print Number 1772a
- Amend And Recommit To Banks
On January 17, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Banks