+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On January 12, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred To Judiciary
On January 12, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
On January 5, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.84
On January 5, 2022 in the Senate:
- Returned To Assembly
- Died In Senate
On June 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred To Rules
On June 7, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.416
- Rules Report Cal.416
- Reported
On May 26, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Rules
On January 11, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Judiciary