+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (6)
On April 1, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Reported referred to codes
On January 8, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Referred to consumer affairs and protection
On February 14, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Print number 1752a
- Amend and recommit to codes
On January 15, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Reported referred to codes
On January 9, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to consumer affairs and protection
+ − Sponsors (25)
Type:
Primary Sponsor