+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On June 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to local government
On June 10, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Delivered to senate
- Passed assembly
On January 8, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading cal.93
On January 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Returned to assembly
- Died in senate
On May 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to local government
On May 6, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Delivered to senate
- Passed assembly
On April 25, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Advanced to third reading cal.198
On April 23, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Reported
On March 12, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Reported referred to ways and means
On January 9, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to local governments
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor