+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On March 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to investigations and government operations
On March 19, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Delivered to senate
- Passed assembly
On January 8, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading cal.92
On January 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Returned to assembly
- Died in senate
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to investigations and government operations
On March 12, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Delivered to senate
- Passed assembly
On January 24, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Advanced to third reading cal.9
- Reported
On January 9, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to governmental operations
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor