+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On May 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Investigations And Government Operations
On May 16, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
On January 6, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.78
On January 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Returned To Assembly
- Died In Senate
On May 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Investigations And Government Operations
On May 11, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
On May 4, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Amended On Third Reading 1669a
On April 30, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Advanced To Third Reading Cal.231
On April 28, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Reported
On April 22, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Ways And Means
On January 12, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Governmental Operations