+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On June 19, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Substituted by s3693
- Rules report cal.593
- Reported
- Reported referred to rules
On January 22, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Reported referred to ways and means
On January 8, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Referred to agriculture
On May 7, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Reported referred to ways and means
On January 9, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to agriculture