+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On January 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Environmental Conservation
On January 11, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
On January 6, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.11
On January 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Returned To Assembly
- Died In Senate
On June 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Environmental Conservation
On June 11, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
On June 10, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.196
- Rules Report Cal.196
- Reported
On June 8, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Rules
On June 1, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Codes
On January 7, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Environmental Conservation