+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On July 31, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Signed chap.183
- Signed chap.183
On July 19, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Delivered to governor
On June 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Returned to assembly
- Passed senate
- 3rd reading cal.1208
- Substituted for s5030
On May 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to veterans, homeland security and military affairs
On May 29, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Delivered to senate
- Passed assembly
On May 16, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Advanced to third reading cal.345
On May 13, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Reported
On April 30, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Reported referred to ways and means
On April 16, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Print number 1601a
- Amend and recommit to veterans' affairs
On January 9, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to veterans' affairs
+ − Vote
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor