+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (17)
On May 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to housing, construction and community development
On May 13, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Delivered to senate
- Passed assembly
On February 6, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Advanced to third reading cal.434
On February 4, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Reported
On January 27, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Reported referred to codes
On January 14, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Committed to housing
On January 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Died in senate
- Returned to assembly
On January 8, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading cal.86
On June 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to housing, construction and community development
On June 13, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Delivered to senate
- Passed assembly
On April 18, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Advanced to third reading cal.136
On April 16, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Reported
On March 20, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Reported referred to codes
On January 9, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to housing
+ − Sponsors (39)
Type:
Primary Sponsor