+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On January 8, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Referred to transportation
On May 7, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Amended on third reading (t) 1581a
- Star removed
- Amended on third reading (t) 1581a
- Star removed
On April 29, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Starred on calendar
- Starred on calendar
On April 25, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Advanced to third reading cal.194
On April 23, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Reported
On January 9, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to transportation
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor