+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On February 5, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Opinion referred to judiciary
On January 10, 2014 in the Assembly:
- To attorney-general for opinion
On January 8, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Referred to governmental employees
On February 4, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Opinion referred to judiciary
On January 10, 2013 in the Assembly:
- To attorney-general for opinion
On January 9, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to governmental employees
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor