+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On December 16, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Approval Memo.45
- Signed Chap.654
On December 10, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- 3rd Reading Cal.1754
- Substituted For S1944a
On June 18, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Passed Assembly
- Delivered To Senate
On June 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred To Rules
On June 17, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.325
- Rules Report Cal.325
- Reported
On June 13, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Rules
On June 11, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Print Number 1569a
- Amend And Recommit To Codes
On June 4, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Codes
On January 15, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Judiciary
+ − Vote
June 19, 2019: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 62
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor