+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On January 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Health
On January 26, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
On January 6, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.74
On January 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Returned To Assembly
- Died In Senate
On June 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Health
On June 8, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.62
- Rules Report Cal.62
- Reported
On June 3, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Rules
On March 3, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Ways And Means
On January 12, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Health
+ − Sponsors (19)
Type:
Primary Sponsor