+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (21)
On May 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to health
On May 20, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Passed assembly
- Delivered to senate
On May 15, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Advanced to third reading cal.672
On May 13, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Reported
On January 27, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Reported referred to ways and means
On January 22, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Committed to health
On January 8, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading cal.83
On January 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Returned to assembly
- Died in senate
On June 20, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Passed assembly
On June 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to rules
On June 20, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Delivered to senate
On June 19, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading rules cal.498
- Rules report cal.498
- Reported
- Reported referred to rules
On June 17, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Print number 1538a
- Amend and recommit to ways and means
On January 15, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Reported referred to ways and means
On January 9, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to health
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor